EP0722400 - ARTICULATED, LOW LEVEL RAILROAD CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THRALL CAR MANUFACTURING COMPANY 2521 State Street Chicago Heights, IL 60411-0218 / US | [1996/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHMOND, Shaun 9151 Sunrise Lane Orland Park, IL 60462 / US | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95908715.6 | 27.01.1995 | [1996/30] | WO1995US01129 | Priority number, date | US19940188524 | 28.01.1994 Original published format: US 188524 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520513 | Date: | 03.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0722400 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0722400 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B61D17/00, B61D3/18 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
B61D3/184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/30] | Extension states | SI | 22.08.1995 | Title | German: | GELENKIGER NIEDERFLUR-EISENBAHNWAGEN | [1996/30] | English: | ARTICULATED, LOW LEVEL RAILROAD CAR | [1996/30] | French: | WAGON DE CHEMIN DE FER BAS ET ARTICULE | [1996/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.1995 | Search fee paid | 22.08.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.08.1995 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 22.08.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.11.2001 | BE | 07.11.2001 | CH | 07.11.2001 | GR | 07.11.2001 | IT | 07.11.2001 | LI | 07.11.2001 | NL | 07.11.2001 | LU | 27.01.2002 | IE | 28.01.2002 | DK | 07.02.2002 | PT | 07.02.2002 | SE | 07.02.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | MC | 01.08.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/44] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
LU | 27.01.2002 | ||
IE | 28.01.2002 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
MC | 01.08.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
LU | 27.01.2002 | ||
IE | 28.01.2002 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
IE | 28.01.2002 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
IE | 28.01.2002 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
IE | 28.01.2002 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 07.11.2001 | |
BE | 07.11.2001 | ||
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 07.11.2001 | |
CH | 07.11.2001 | ||
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
NL | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 07.11.2001 | |
PT | 07.02.2002 | ||
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 07.02.2002 | |
SE | 07.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 07.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4274776 (PATON H NEIL, et al) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 39 - column 7, line 23; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP0324987 (TALBOT WAGGONFAB [DE]) [X] 1,5* column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 46; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5246321 (HESCH HAROLD E [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 46; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]US3399631 (WEBER HANS B); | [Y]US3568607 (GUTRIDGE JACK E); | [A]US4524699 (PAVLICK MICHAEL J [US]); | [XY]US4686907 (WOOLLAM RONALD F [CA], et al); | [A]US4751882 (WHEATLEY THOMAS W [CA], et al); | [Y]US4826371 (BROWN JAMES T [US]); | [A]US4929132 (YEATES RICHARD P [US], et al) |