EP0805714 - A METHOD FOR INJECTING A PRODUCT INTO A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/46] | A METHOD FOR INJECTING A PRODUCT INTO A FLUID, AND AN APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | ||
[1999/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIRO HOLDING A/S Gladsaxevej 305 2860 Soeborg / DK | [1997/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASMUSSEN, Carsten, Ole Magleholm 16 DK-2600 Glostrup / DK | [1997/46] | Representative(s) | Raffnsoee, Knud Rosenstand, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | Raffnsöe, Knud Rosenstand, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau, 23 Höje Taastrup Boulevard 2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 95908886.5 | 24.01.1995 | [1997/46] | WO1995DK00035 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9622830 | Date: | 01.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0805714 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0805714 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/06, B01F7/00 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
B01F27/2711 (EP,US);
B01F2025/9122 (EP,US);
B01F27/80 (EP,US);
Y10S261/26 (EP,US);
Y10S261/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPRITZEN VON EINEM PRODUCKT IN EINE FLÜSSIGKEIT | [1999/04] | English: | A METHOD FOR INJECTING A PRODUCT INTO A FLUID | [1999/04] | French: | PROCEDE D'INJECTION D'UN PRODUIT DANS UN FLUIDE | [1999/04] |
Former [1997/46] | VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPRITZEN VON EINEM PRODUCKT IN EINE FLÜSSIGKEIT UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | ||
Former [1997/46] | A METHOD FOR INJECTING A PRODUCT INTO A FLUID, AND AN APPARATUS FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD | ||
Former [1997/46] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'INJECTION D'UN PRODUIT DANS UN FLUIDE | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1997 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/46] | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.1999 | BE | 15.09.1999 | CH | 15.09.1999 | ES | 15.09.1999 | IT | 15.09.1999 | LI | 15.09.1999 | SE | 15.09.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
BE | 15.09.1999 | ||
CH | 15.09.1999 | ||
ES | 15.09.1999 | ||
LI | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
BE | 15.09.1999 | ||
CH | 15.09.1999 | ||
LI | 15.09.1999 | ||
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
BE | 15.09.1999 | ||
CH | 15.09.1999 | ||
LI | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
BE | 15.09.1999 | ||
CH | 21.12.1999 | ||
LI | 21.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 15.09.1999 | |
BE | 15.09.1999 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3127684 ; | [A]DE3417242 (HAAGEN & RINAU [DE]); | [A]WO9413395 (NIRO HOLDING AS [DK], et al) |