EP0748532 - ENVIRONMENTAL SEALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. RAYCHEM S.A. Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [1996/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAMBEKE, Alain Solveld 32 B-3440 Zoutleeuw / BE | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan, Swindon Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Clayton, Anthony Nicholas, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Dept. Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95909044.0 | 24.02.1995 | [1996/51] | WO1995GB00383 | Priority number, date | GB19940003838 | 28.02.1994 Original published format: GB 9403838 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9523448 | Date: | 31.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748532 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748532 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02G15/013 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
H02G15/013 (EP,KR,US);
H02G9/06 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1043 (EP,US);
Y10T403/48 (EP,US);
Y10T403/559 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/51] | Title | German: | ABDICHTUNG GEGENÜBER UMWELTEINFLÜSSEN | [1996/51] | English: | ENVIRONMENTAL SEALING | [1996/51] | French: | ELEMENT D'ETANCHEITE PROTEGEANT CONTRE L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [1996/51] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Request for further processing for: | 21.07.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.08.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3336456 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,9-11 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0265259 (ALH SYST LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1,2,9-11* column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 17; figure 9 *; | [A]EP0368493 (ALH SYST LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,9-11 * column 3, line 15 - line 50; figures 1,2 *; | [YDA]WO9219034 (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1 * figures 1,2,6; claims 1-6,26,33 * [A] 4-7; | [YA]DE9311800U (LANGMATZ LIC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 11; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,9-11 |