EP0746608 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF AN IMMOBILIZED ENZYME PREPARATION AND USE OF THE IMMOBILIZED ENZYME PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogsho̸jvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Sven Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 02 /
LARSEN, Anne Morkeberg Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 03 /
AASMUL, Per Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [1996/50] | Application number, filing date | 95909664.5 | 21.02.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995DK00076 | Priority number, date | DK19940000207 | 21.02.1994 Original published format: DK 20794 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522606 | Date: | 24.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746608 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0746608 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N11/14, C12N9/20, // C01B33/20 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
C12N9/20 (EP,US);
C12N11/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER IMMOBILISIERTEN ENZYMPRÄPARATION UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [1996/50] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF AN IMMOBILIZED ENZYME PREPARATION AND USE OF THE IMMOBILIZED ENZYME PREPARATION | [1996/50] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION D'UNE PREPARATION ENZYMATIQUE IMMOBILISEE ET UTILISATION DE CETTE PREPARATION | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 23.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2003 | BE | 20.08.2003 | CH | 20.08.2003 | IT | 20.08.2003 | LI | 20.08.2003 | GR | 20.11.2003 | SE | 20.11.2003 | ES | 01.12.2003 | PT | 20.01.2004 | LU | 21.02.2004 | IE | 23.02.2004 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
LU | 21.02.2004 | ||
IE | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
IE | 23.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
ES | 01.12.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
PT | 20.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
BE | 20.08.2003 | ||
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
CH | 20.08.2003 | ||
LI | 20.08.2003 | ||
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
GR | 20.11.2003 | ||
SE | 20.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 20.08.2003 | |
GR | 20.11.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0093027 (ARGILES & MINERAUX [FR]); | [Y]EP0159578 (REDCO NV [BE]); | [Y]WO9005778 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [XP]WO9426883 (GIST BROCADES NV [NL], et al) | Examination | EP0382767 | - KIRAN L KADAM, "Introduction", GRANULATION TECHNOLOGY FOR BIOPRODUCTS, BOCA RATON, (1990), pages 1 - 8 | - JOSEPH B SCHWARTZ, "Theory of Granulation", GRANULATION TECHNOLOGY FOR BIOPRODUCTS, BOCA RATON, (1990), pages 9 - 28 | - CELITE CORPORATION: Technical Data for Celkate T-21 |