EP0746550 - SUBSTITUTED TRIAZOLINONES AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINKER, Karl-Heinz Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 3 D-51377 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
FINDEISEN, Kurt Dünfelder Strasse 28 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
HAAS, Wilhelm Schürgespfad 19 D-50259 Pulheim / DE | 04 /
SCHALLNER, Otto Noldeweg 22 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
WROBLOWSKY, Heinz-Jürgen Virneburgstrasse 73 D-40764 Langenfeld / DE | 06 /
DOLLINGER, Markus Burscheider Strasse 154b D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | 07 /
SANTEL, Hans-Joachim Grünstrasse 9a D-51371 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/50] | Application number, filing date | 95909695.9 | 09.02.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995EP00466 | Priority number, date | DE19944405614 | 22.02.1994 Original published format: DE 4405614 | [1996/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9522532 | Date: | 24.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746550 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D249/20, C07F9/6518, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07F9/6558, A01N43/653, A01N57/24, A01N47/06 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP);
A01N43/653 (EP);
A01N47/06 (EP);
A01N47/20 (EP);
A01N47/30 (EP);
A01N47/42 (EP);
A01N57/24 (EP);
C07D249/12 (EP);
C07D409/14 (EP);
C07F9/6518 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/50] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE TRIAZOLINONE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS HERBIZIDE | [1996/50] | English: | SUBSTITUTED TRIAZOLINONES AND THEIR USE AS HERBICIDES | [1996/50] | French: | TRIAZOLINONES SUBSTITUEES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME HERBICIDES | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 30.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/31] | 09.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP0370332 (BAYER AG) [DX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [DPX]EP0597360 (BAYER AG) [DPX] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0617026 (BAYER AG) [PA] 1-8 * column W *; | [PA]EP0609734 (BAYER AG) [PA] 1-8 * column W * |