EP0746490 - DRIVABLE CLEANING VEHICLE WITH TRAILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel-Ecolab GmbH & Co. OHG Postfach 130406 40554 Düsseldorf / DE | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRESSE, Franz Am Bruchhauser Kamp 12 D-40723 Hilden / DE | 02 /
OSBERGHAUS, Rainer Südallee 47 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
SCHUNTER, Roland Birkenstrasse 9 D-73547 Lorch / DE | 04 /
FERNSCHILD, Hans-Leo Mühlenstrasse 1 D-41352 Korschenbroich / DE | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Wilk, Hans-Christoph, et al C/o Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Wilk, Hans-Christof, Dr., et al c/o Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95909756.9 | 21.02.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995EP00621 | Priority number, date | DE19944406749 | 02.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4406749 | [1996/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9523720 | Date: | 08.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746490 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0746490 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/02 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
B62B3/02 (EP,US);
B62B2202/50 (EP,US);
B62B2207/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT, NL [1996/50] | Title | German: | FAHRBARER REINIGUNGSWAGEN MIT ANHÄNGER | [1996/50] | English: | DRIVABLE CLEANING VEHICLE WITH TRAILER | [1996/50] | French: | CHARIOT DE NETTOYAGE A REMORQUE | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 15.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2382989 (GILBERT PHILO G) [Y] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]US2555178 (YOUNG PAUL O); | [PY]DE4320454 (HENKEL ECOLAB GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [PY] 1-3 * column 5, line 10 - line 24; figures 4,5,8,9 * |