EP0857532 - GEAR FINISHING DEVICE WITH A HELICAL CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome Amagasaki-Shi Hyogo-661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/33] | For all designated states KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG. CO., LTD. 18-1, Inadera 2-Chome Amagasaki-Shi, Hyogo-661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIHARA, Toshihide 12-18, Tomimatsucho 3-chome Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 661 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Ryoji 26-32, Senriyamahigashi 2-chome Suita-shi Osaka 565 / JP | [1998/33] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [1998/33] | Goodwin, Mark, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 95910001.7 | 28.02.1995 | [1998/33] | WO1995JP00313 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9626804 | Date: | 06.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0857532 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1996 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.09.1996 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23F19/05 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
B23F19/057 (EP,US);
Y10T409/101272 (EP,US);
Y10T409/105724 (EP,US);
Y10T409/107632 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/33] | Title | German: | SCHRÄGSTIRNRADNACHBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE MIT SCHRÄGUNGSWINKELABHÄNGER WERKZEUGDREHGESCHWINDIGKEITSKORREKTUR | [1998/33] | English: | GEAR FINISHING DEVICE WITH A HELICAL CORRECTION | [1998/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FINITION D'ENGRENAGE A CORRECTION HELICOIDALE | [1998/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.1997 | Translation filed | 21.08.1997 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.1997 | Search fee paid | 21.08.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1996 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 23.10.1997 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 06.02.1998 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected | 16.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9300936U (PRÄWEMA WERKZEUGMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5347760 (MIYAUCH MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH0639635 (NACHI FUJIKOSHI CORP); | [A]JPH06254719 (TOYO A TEC KK); | [AE]JPH0760542 (HURTH MASCHINEN WERKZEUGE) |