blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0743870

EP0743870 - PREPARATION AND APPLICATION OF ARTIFICIAL ANTI-IDIOTYPIC IMPRINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 18.07.2007  [2007/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOSBACH, Klaus
Lackalänga 31, PL 5548
S-244 94 Furulund / SE
[N/P]
Former [1996/48]For all designated states
MOSBACH, Klaus
Lackalänga 31, PL 5548
S-244 94 Furulund / SE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1996/48]
Representative(s)Wiklund, Ingrid Helena
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [1996/48]Wiklund, Ingrid Helena
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date95910042.110.02.1995
[1996/48]
WO1995SE00135
Priority number, dateSE1994000045010.02.1994         Original published format: SE 9400450
[1996/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9521673
Date:17.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0743870
Date:27.11.1996
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1996/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0743870
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE17.08.1995
ClassificationIPC:B01D15/08, C07K16/00, A61K39/00, // G01N33/53
[1996/48]
CPC:
B01J20/268 (EP,SE,US); C07K16/4208 (EP,SE,US); G01N33/686 (EP,SE,US);
G01N2600/00 (EP,SE,US); Y10S264/44 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1996/48]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNG VON KÜNSTLICHEN ANTI-IDIOTYPISCHEN ABDRÜCKEN[1999/19]
English:PREPARATION AND APPLICATION OF ARTIFICIAL ANTI-IDIOTYPIC IMPRINTS[1996/48]
French:PREPARATION ET UTILISATION D'EMPREINTES ANTI-IDIOTYPES ARTIFICIELLES[1996/48]
Former [1996/48]HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNG VON KÜNSTLICHEN ANTI-IDIOTYPISCHEN ABDRÜCKE
Entry into regional phase04.09.1996National basic fee paid 
04.09.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
04.09.1996Examination requested  [1996/48]
16.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.10.1998Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.1999Fee for grant paid
14.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP99113261.4  / EP0982591
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Request for further processing for:17.12.1998Request for further processing filed
21.12.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.01.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
03.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199804   M06   Fee paid on   20.07.1998
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
IE10.02.2000
LU10.02.2000
MC26.03.2000
PT26.04.2000
[2007/29]
Former [2004/07]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
IE10.02.2000
MC26.03.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2002/42]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
IE10.02.2000
MC26.03.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2002/26]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
ES26.01.2000
IE10.02.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2001/17]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
IE10.02.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2001/09]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
PT26.04.2000
Former [2001/08]AT26.01.2000
BE26.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]US5110833  (MOSBACH KLAUS [SE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.