EP0741709 - AROMATIC 2-AMINO-IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AS ALPHA-2A ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN SALES, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states Allergan Sales, Inc. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states Allergan 8301 Mars Drive Waco, TX 76712 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNK, Stephen, A. 30 Bluejay Irvine, CA 92714 / US | 02 /
GARST, Michael, E. 2433 Vista Hogar Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | 03 /
HARCOURT, Dale, A. 320 E. Avenida Cordoba San Clemente, CA 92672 / US | 04 /
GLUCHOWSKI, Charles 153 Chopin Drive Wayne, NJ 07470 / US | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | ||
Former [1996/46] | Hutchins, Michael Richard FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95910135.3 | 24.01.1995 | [1996/46] | WO1995US01150 | Priority number, date | US19940186406 | 24.01.1994 Original published format: US 186406 | US19940185653 | 24.01.1994 Original published format: US 185653 | [1996/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9519968 | Date: | 27.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741709 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741709 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/88, A61K31/415, A61K31/335, A61K31/495, A61K31/535, C07D403/12, C07D405/12, C07D413/12 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P23/02 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D233/88 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/46] | Title | German: | AROMATISCHE 2-AMINO-IMIDAZOLDERIVATE ALS ALPHA 2A-ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTEN | [1996/46] | English: | AROMATIC 2-AMINO-IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AS ALPHA-2A ADRENOCEPTOR AGONISTS | [1996/46] | French: | DERIVES AROMATIQUES 2-AMINO-IMIDAZOLE UTILISES COMME AGONISTES DE L'ADRENORECEPTEUR ALPHA-2A | [1996/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 22.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Request for further processing for: | 05.08.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.08.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB1131191 [ ] (GEIGY AG J R); | [A]WO9204345 (ALLERGAN INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 60 - page 61; claim 1 * * page 46; example 45 * * page 1, line 5 - line 11 * | [DX] - N. GRUENFELD, "Imidazoles.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19690317), vol. 70, no. 11, Database accession no. 47457q, page 339, column 2 [DX] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - Y. AMEMIYA ET AL., "Synthesis and alpha-Adrenergic Activities of 2- and 4-Substituted Imidazoline and Imidazole Analogues", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (19920221), vol. 35, no. 4, pages 750 - 755 [A] 1-11 * see page 752; table I, compounds no. 4 and 6 * | [A] - M. MATSUO ET AL., "New Aryliminoimidazolidines. I. Synthesis and Antihypertensive Properties of 2-(2-Phenoxyphenylimino)imidazolidines and Related Compounds", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, TOKYO JP, (198510), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 4409 - 4421 [A] 1-11 * page 4415, line 14 - line 15 * | Examination | - MORRISON R.T.; BOYD R.N.: "Organic Chemistry", 3rd Edition, 1975, p. 596, Allyn and Bacon, Boston, US | - SYKES P.: "A Guidebook to Mechanism in Organic Chemistry", 5th Edition, 1981, pp. 345-378, Longman, London, GB | - WELLS P.R.: "LInear Free Energy Relationships", 1968, p. 14, Academic Press, London, GB |