blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0753302

EP0753302 - OSTEOPOROSIS PREVENTING OR TREATING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2004Revocation of patentpublished on 28.04.2004  [2004/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd.
4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8002 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/25]For all designated states
Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd.
4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8002 / JP
Former [1997/03]For all designated states
MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA LTD.
4-16 Kyobashi 2-chome
Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OHTA, Atsutane Bioscience Labs. of
Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd. 3-1, Chiyoda 5-chome
Sakado-shi Saitama 350-02 / JP
02 / TAKIZAWA, Toshio Bioscience Labs. of
Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd. 3-1, Chiyoda 5-chome
Sakado-shi Saitama 350-02 / JP
03 / ADACHI, Takashi Bioscience Labs. of
Meiji Seika Kaisha, Ltd. 3-1, Chiyoda 5-chome
Sakado-shi Saitama 350-02 / JP
[1997/03]
Representative(s)Wilhelms, Rolf E., et al
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/03]Wilhelms, Rolf E., Dr., et al
WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date95910802.813.03.1995
[1997/03]
WO1995JP00413
Priority number, dateJP1994006898715.03.1994         Original published format: JP 6898794
[1997/03]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9524909
Date:21.09.1995
Language:EN
[1995/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0753302
Date:15.01.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0753302
Date:19.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP21.09.1995
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61K33/06, A61K33/26, A61K33/42, A61K31/70, A61K47/26, A61P19/10
[2001/34]
CPC:
A61K33/42 (EP,US); A61K33/06 (EP,US); A61K33/26 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP); A61P3/00 (EP); A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/06, A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K33/06, A61K31/715 (EP,US);
A61K33/26, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/26, A61K33/06, A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K33/26, A61K33/06, A61K31/715 (US,EP);
A61K33/42, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/42, A61K33/06, A61K31/70 (US,EP);
A61K33/42, A61K33/26, A61K33/06, A61K31/70 (US,EP);
A61K33/42, A61K33/26, A61K33/06, A61K31/715 (US,EP)
(-)
Former IPC [1997/03]A61K33/06, A61K33/26, A61K33/42, A61K31/70, A61K47/26
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/03]
TitleGerman:WIRKSTOFF ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON OSTEOPOROSE[1997/03]
English:OSTEOPOROSIS PREVENTING OR TREATING AGENT[1997/03]
French:AGENT DE PREVENTION OU DE TRAITEMENT DE L'OSTEOPOROSE[1997/03]
Entry into regional phase12.09.1996Translation filed 
12.09.1996National basic fee paid 
12.09.1996Search fee paid 
12.09.1996Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.1996Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1995Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
12.09.1996Examination requested  [1997/03]
21.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.2002Fee for grant paid
22.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2003  28.03.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Friesland Brands B.V.
P. Stuyvesantweg 1
8937 AC Leeuwarden / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al, et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
 02  19.03.2003  28.03.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Tiense Suikerraffinaderij n.v.
Tervurenlaan 182
1150 Brussel / BE
Opponent's representative
Hermans, Johny
Tiense Suikerraffinaderij N.V., Patent Department, Aandorenstraat 1
3300 Tienen / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2003/20]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2003  28.03.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Friesland Brands B.V.
P. Stuyvesantweg 1
8937 AC Leeuwarden / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al, et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
 02  19.03.2003  28.03.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Tiense Suikerraffinaderij n.v.
Tervurenlaan 182
Brussel / BE
Opponent's representative
Hermans, Johny
Tiense Suikerraffinaderij N.V., Patent Department, Aandorenstraat 1
3300 Tienen / BE
25.04.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.11.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
05.12.2003Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0346866  (BIOCHEMIE GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 11 * * examples 1-7 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [X]  - WEBB B.H. ET AL., Fundamentals of Dairy Chemistry, WESTPORT, CT, AVI PUBLISHING COMPANY INC., (1978), XP002125561 [X] 1-6 * page 1 - page 57 *
 [X]  - NI LUH PUSPITASARI ET AL, "CALCIUM FORTIFICATION OF COTTAGE CHEESE WITH HYDROCOLLOID CONTROL OF BITTER FLAVOR DEFECTS", JOURNAL OF DAIRY SCIENCE,US,AMERICAN DAIR SCIENCE ASSOCIATION. CHAPAIGN, ILLINOIS, vol. 74, no. 1, ISSN 0022-0302, page 1-7, XP000179737 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * Introduction * * tables 1-3 * * figure 1 *
 [X]  - GREGER, J.L., "Calcium Bioavailability", CEREAL FOODS WORLD, (198809), vol. 33, no. 9, pages 796 - 800, XP002125560 [X] 1-6 * page 796, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 796, column 3, paragraph 4 - page 797, column 3, paragraph 1 * * page 799, Summary *
International search[A]JPH04349868  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [A]JPH04360664  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND);
 [X]JPH05238940  (POLA CHEM IND INC);
 [X]JPH05316997  (POLA CHEM IND INC);
 [A]JPH0640922  (MORINAGA MILK INDUSTRY CO LTD);
 [P]JPH06205654  (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD);
 [P]JPH06205653  (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD);
 [P]JPH06228181  (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD);
 [E]JPH0767575  (SUNTORY LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.