EP0743864 - WINGED BILIARY STENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHECKMED SYSTEMS, INC. 200 Grandview Avenue Camp Hill, Pennsylvania 17011 / US | [2004/20] |
Former [1997/45] | For all designated states Pasricha, Pankaj 10708 Forestgate Place Glenn Dale, Maryland 20769 / US | ||
For all designated states Kalloo, Anthony 10708 Forestgate Place Glenn Dale, Maryland 20769 / US | |||
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states THE JOHNS-HOPKINS UNIVERSITY 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASRICHA, Pankaj, J. 5007 Southern Star Terrace Columbia, MD 21044 / US | 02 /
KALLOO, Anthony, N. 5007 Southern Star Terrace Columbia, MD 21044 / US | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Laight, Martin Harvey, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Laight, Martin Harvey, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95910881.2 | 31.01.1995 | [1996/48] | WO1995US00970 | Priority number, date | US19940190465 | 02.02.1994 Original published format: US 190465 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9520986 | Date: | 10.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0743864 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743864 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M27/00, A61F2/06 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/94 (EP,US);
A61F2002/041 (EP,US);
A61F2230/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/48] | A61M5/00, A61M27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [1996/48] | Title | German: | STENT MIT FLÜGELN FÜR DEN GALLENGANG | [1996/48] | English: | WINGED BILIARY STENT | [1996/48] | French: | DRAIN TUTEUR A AILETTES POUR CANAL BILIAIRE | [1996/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.1996 | Search fee paid | 28.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 22.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Request for further processing for: | 22.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR564832 (PEYRET) [X] 4,6-9,13 * the whole document * [A] 1,2; | [A]DE88138 (BENNER) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB105038 (LIDDELL JAMES ALEXANDER) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0059620 (BLAKE L W [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]US4307723 (FINNEY ROY P) [A] 1,2,4 * column A; figure - * | International search | [A]US3821956 (GORDHAMER D); | [Y]US4459318 (HYANS THOMAS E [US]); | [Y]US4677143 (LAURIN DEAN [US], et al); | [Y]US4795439 (GUEST ROBERT L [US]); | [Y]SU1641356 (KB GORODSK BOLNITSA PIROGOVA [SU]); | [A]GB189127 (MANUEL HERANTE HANTCHER) |