Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0746429
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.02.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
18.10.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
31.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
31.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.11.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
04.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.03.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.01.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.01.2000 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
17.09.1999 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
10.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
31.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.11.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.12.1996 |
First examination report |
|
12.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.10.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |
25.10.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |
17.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
15.08.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|