EP0746492 - VARIABLE-RATIO HYDRAULIC STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1999 [1999/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDRAULIK NORD GMBH Ludwigsluster Chaussee 19370 Parchim / DE | [1998/21] |
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states HYDRAULIK NORD GMBH Ludwigsluster Chaussee D-19370 Parchim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMANN, Erhard Kiekut 12 D-19079 Mirow / DE | 02 /
SCHILDMANN, Manfred Geschw.-Scholl-Strasse 30 D-19370 Parchim / DE | 03 /
VOSS, Gerhard Karl-Liebknecht-Strasse 9 D-19370 Parchim / DE | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Jaap, Reinhard Buchholzallee 32 19370 Parchim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Jaap, Reinhard Invalidenstrasse 13 19370 Parchim / DE | Application number, filing date | 95911197.2 | 23.02.1995 | [1996/50] | WO1995DE00246 | Priority number, date | DE19944407308 | 04.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4407308 | [1996/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9523723 | Date: | 08.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0746492 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0746492 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/32 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
B62D5/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, GB, IT [1996/50] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE LENKEINRICHTUNG MIT ÜBERSETZUNGSÄNDERUNG | [1996/50] | English: | VARIABLE-RATIO HYDRAULIC STEERING SYSTEM | [1996/50] | French: | DIRECTION HYDRAULIQUE A DEMULTIPLICATION VARIABLE | [1996/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5050696 (MCGOVERN DONALD E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 39; figures 2,3 * [A] 6; | [DY]DE2228531 (SASNOWSKI HYDRAULIK NORD) [DY] 1-4 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 42; figures 1-3 *; | [DYA]DE2140569 (DANFOSS AS) [DY] 1-4 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 5, line 1 - page 9, line 23; figures 1-4 * [A] 6 |