EP0742853 - IRONING MACHINE WITH TENSIONER AND STRETCHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engel, Harald Eichenweg 11 A-2380 Perchtoldsdorf / AT | [1996/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E., et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/47] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95911251.7 | 22.02.1995 | [1996/47] | WO1995EP00645 | Priority number, date | DE19944409876 | 22.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4409876 | [1996/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525839 | Date: | 28.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742853 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0742853 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | D06F71/29 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
D06F71/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | BÜGELMASCHINE MIT SPANN- UND STRECKVORRICHTUNG | [1996/47] | English: | IRONING MACHINE WITH TENSIONER AND STRETCHER | [1996/47] | French: | MACHINE A REPASSER COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF TENDEUR ET EXTENSEUR | [1996/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/47] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0253048 (TEXMA TEXTILMASCH & ARMATUREN [AT]) [AD] 1-6,9,10,13 * column W *; | [A]DE1157192 (KANNEGIESSER & CO MASCHF) [A] 7-9,13 * the whole document *; | [A]US3126658 (T.W. CARSKADON) |