EP0750660 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING DIRT-LOOSENING GRANULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [1997/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGER, Manfred Graudenzer Strasse 34 D-40559 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
JACOBS, Jochen Teschensudberg 50 D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
KÜHNE, Norbert Dürerstrasse 63 D-42781 Haan / DE | 04 /
SCHAMBIL, Fred Niederstrasse 96 D-40789 Monheim / DE | 05 /
ASSMANN, Georg Dechant Königs-Strasse 9 D-41363 Jüchen / DE | 06 /
BAUER, Volker Marconistrasse 13 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 07 /
MARSCHNER, Michael Zirbelweg 2 D-41470 Neuss / DE | 08 /
KERGL, Max-Peter Richrather Strasse 98 D-40723 Hilden / DE | 09 /
MEINE, Georg Hofstadt 4 D-40822 Mettmann / DE | 10 /
JUNG, Dieter Am Eichelkamp 199 D-40723 Hilden / DE | [1998/21] |
Former [1997/01] | 01 /
GREGER, Manfred Graudenzer Strasse 34 D-40559 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02 /
JACOBS, Jochen Teschensudberg 50 D-42349 Wuppertal / DE | |||
03 /
KÜHNE, Norbert Dürerstrasse 63 D-42781 Haan / DE | |||
04 /
SCHAMBIL, Fred Niederstrasse 96 D-40789 Monheim / DE | |||
05 /
ASSMANN, Georg Dechant-Königs-Strasse 9 D-41363 Jüchen / DE | |||
06 /
BAUER, Volker Marconistrasse 13 D-40589 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
07 /
MARSCHNER, Michael Zirbelweg 2 D-41470 Neuss / DE | |||
08 /
KERGL, Max-Peter Richrather Strasse 98 D-40723 Hilden / DE | |||
09 /
MEINE, Georg Hofstadt 4 D-40822 Mettmann / DE | |||
10 /
JUNG, Dieter Am Eichelkamp 199 D-40723 Hilden / DE | Application number, filing date | 95911298.8 | 06.03.1995 | [1997/01] | WO1995EP00818 | Priority number, date | DE19944408360 | 14.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4408360 | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525158 | Date: | 21.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750660 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750660 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/00, C11D11/00 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
C11D17/0034 (EP);
C08J3/201 (EP);
C11D11/0082 (EP);
C11D11/0088 (EP);
C11D3/0036 (EP);
C11D3/3715 (EP);
C08J2367/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [1997/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SCHMUTZLÖSENDER GRANULATE | [1997/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING DIRT-LOOSENING GRANULATES | [1997/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE GRANULES ELIMINANT LES SALISSURES | [1997/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE2200911 (UNILEVER NV) [DA] 1,12 * claims 1,5 *; | [A]GB1437076 (UNILEVER LTD) [A] 1,4,9,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US4020015 (BEVAN GEOFFREY) [A] 1,12* claim - *; | [DA]DE3324258 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [DA] 1,4,9,12 * example -; claim - *; | [DA]US4569772 (CIALLELLA LORETTA K [US]) [DA] 1,4,9,12 * claim - * |