Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0746778
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.07.2001 |
Refusal of application |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
09.04.2001 |
Application refused |
|
29.03.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
27.01.2001 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
09.10.2000 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
14.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.03.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.02.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.10.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.07.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.03.1999 |
First examination report |
|
23.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.04.1997 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.10.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |
25.10.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |
19.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|