EP0749355 - THERMAL STRESS RESISTANT MONOLITHIC CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue Iselin New Jersey 08830-0770 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states ENGELHARD CORPORATION 101 Wood Avenue Iselin, New Jersey 08830-0770 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DETTLING, Joseph, C. 8 Spicy Pond Road Howell, NJ 07731 / US | 02 /
RABINOWITZ, Harold 135 Buckingham Road Upper Montclair, NJ 07043 / US | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 95911692.2 | 13.02.1995 | [1996/52] | WO1995US01758 | Priority number, date | US19940207643 | 08.03.1994 Original published format: US 207643 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9524270 | Date: | 14.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0749355 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749355 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/02, B01J35/04, C04B41/89 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP);
B01J35/56 (EP);
B01J37/0215 (EP);
C04B41/4582 (EP);
C04B2111/0081 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B38/0006 (EP);
C04B41/4582, C04B41/5027 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/52] | Extension states | LT | 02.09.1996 | SI | 02.09.1996 | Title | German: | GEGEN THERMISCHER SPANNUNG BESTÄNDIGER MONOLITHISCHER KATALYSATOR | [2001/22] | English: | THERMAL STRESS RESISTANT MONOLITHIC CATALYST | [1996/52] | French: | CATALYSEUR MONOLITHIQUE RESISTANT AUX CHOCS THERMIQUES | [1996/52] |
Former [1996/52] | GEGEN THERMISCHEN SPANNUNG BESTÄNDIGER MONOLITHISCHER KATALYSATOR | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 18.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Request for further processing for: | 20.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 20.10.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.11.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2002 | BE | 08.05.2002 | CH | 08.05.2002 | FR | 08.05.2002 | GR | 08.05.2002 | IT | 08.05.2002 | LI | 08.05.2002 | NL | 08.05.2002 | DK | 08.08.2002 | PT | 08.08.2002 | SE | 08.08.2002 | ES | 28.11.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
FR | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
ES | 28.11.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
FR | 17.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/08] | NL | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 08.08.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2160905 (JOHNSON MATTHEY CO LTD); | [A]US4019969 (GOLEBIOWSKI ANDRZEJ, et al); | [A]US4774217 (TAKEUCHI AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]DE3729126 (MOTOTECH MOTOREN UMWELTSCHUTZ [DE]) | Examination | US4849275 | EP0625371 | - Kirk-Othmer, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, volume 9, fourth edition, John Wiley & Sons, New York, 1994,p 992 |