Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0748276
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
29.05.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
18.01.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
20.04.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
17.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
25.06.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] |
09.04.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] |
17.04.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] |
14.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.02.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.08.1997 |
First examination report |
|
07.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.04.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.11.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] |
01.11.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] |
24.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|