Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3585497B | Global Dossier | 04.11.2004 | B2 | JPH09509891 | 07.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 | EP9500883 | 09.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0748276 | Global Dossier | 03.06.1998 | B1 | EP0748276 | 18.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 | EP9500883 | 09.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59502412D1 | 09.07.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 | EP9500883 | 09.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5873304 | 23.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 | EP9500883 | 09.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9524307 | Global Dossier | 14.09.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE166829T | 15.06.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ285809 | 17.11.1999 | B6 | CZ251496 | 12.02.1997 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4408138 | 11.07.1996 | C2 | DE4408138 | 14.09.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2120188T | 16.10.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4408138 | 10.03.1994 |