EP0752837 - URINE COLLECTION MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van den Burg, Anthonius Daniel Winkelwaard 219 1824 HP Alkmaar / NL | [1997/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | de Bruijn, Leendert C. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 95912515.4 | 28.03.1995 | [1997/03] | WO1995NL00118 | Priority number, date | NL19940000487 | 28.03.1994 Original published format: NL 9400487 | [1997/03] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526173 | Date: | 05.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752837 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752837 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/453, A61G9/00 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
A61G9/006 (EP,US);
A61F5/453 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1997/03] | Title | German: | URINAUFFANGMITTEL | [1997/03] | English: | URINE COLLECTION MEANS | [1997/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRELEVEMENT D'URINES | [1997/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1996 | Translation filed | 27.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE9100090U (MUNSON ET AL.) [X] 1-4 * page 6, paragraph 3; figure -; claims 1-5,9 * [Y] 5; | [Y]EP0068712 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [XA]GB1311491 (ELLIOT LAB INC) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 2 - line 119; figure -; claim - * [A] 4,5; | [X]US4531245 (LOWD DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2558054 (FACAM SA [FR]) |