EP0749325 - BISPECIFIC MOLECULES HAVING CLINICAL UTILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medarex, Inc. P.O. Box 953 1545 Route 22 East Annandale New Jersey 08801-0953 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states MEDAREX, INC. P.O. Box 953 1545 Route 22 East Annandale New Jersey 08801-0953 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALL, Edward D. 9977 Parkland Drive Wexford, PA 15090 / US | 02 /
FANGER, Michael W., West View Lane Box 421 Lebanon, NH 03766 / US | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [2009/30] |
Former [1996/52] | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 95912740.8 | 07.03.1995 | [1996/52] | WO1995US02750 | Priority number, date | US19940207344 | 07.03.1994 Original published format: US 207344 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9524220 | Date: | 14.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0749325 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749325 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
C07K16/283 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61K47/68 (EP,US);
A61K47/6813 (EP,US);
A61K47/6857 (EP,US);
A61K47/6879 (EP,US);
C07K14/595 (EP,US);
C07K7/086 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/52] | Title | German: | BISPEZIFISCHE MOLEKÜLE MIT KLINISCHER VERWENDBARKEIT | [1996/52] | English: | BISPECIFIC MOLECULES HAVING CLINICAL UTILITIES | [1996/52] | French: | MOLECULES BISPECIFIQUES SE PRETANT A DES UTILISATIONS CLINIQUES | [1996/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 22.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0255249 (DARTMOUTH COLLEGE [US]) [DA] 11-17 * claims 1,7,16,25,26,34 *; | US4954617 [ ] (FANGER MICHAEL W [US], et al); | [X]WO9100360 (MEDAREX INC [US]) [X] 1,6-8,11 * claims 1,19 *; | [A]WO9205793 (MEDAREX INC [US]) [A] 21-24 * page 14 - page 18; example -; claims 1-3,13,36 *; | [Y]US5109115 (CUTTITTA FRANK F [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 39 - line 57; table - * * column 5, line 33 - line 51 * * column 1, line 39 - line 47 * * column 2, line 39 - line 41 *; | [PX]WO9408038 (DARTMOUTH COLLEGE [US]) [PX] 1,6-8,16* claims 1,3,4,14 * | [PXY] - BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US [PX] 1-10 * abstract * [Y] 1 | [ ] - CHEN J. ET AL., "THE IMMUNOCONJUGATE [LYS-3] -BOMBESIN (BN) AND MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY 22 (MAB22-BN) COULD INDUCE MONOCYTE (MO)-MEDIATED LYSIS OF SMALL-CELL LUNG CANCER CELLS (SCLC)", 85TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASOC. OF CANCER RESEARCH, SAN FRANCISCO, CALIF.,USA . PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASOC. FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, (19940410), vol. 35, page 512 |