EP0723671 - LIGHT GENERATOR WITH REFLECTIVE ENCLOSURE FOR LIGHTING OR ILLUMINATING UNIT HAVING A LIGHT GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIRAG S.A. 20, boulevard Galliéni 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [1998/26] |
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states VIRAG S.A. 35, rue de la Pompe F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIRAG, Tibor 37, avenue de Novel F-74000 Annecy / FR | 02 /
PERCEVEAUX, Jean-Luc Route de la Tuilerie F-74410 Saint-Jorioz / FR | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 95912945.3 | 11.10.1994 | [1996/31] | WO1994FR01182 | Priority number, date | FR19930012119 | 12.10.1993 Original published format: FR 9312119 | [1996/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9510792 | Date: | 20.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0723671 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, F21V7/09 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
F21V7/0008 (EP);
F21V29/15 (EP);
F21V29/505 (EP);
F21V29/71 (EP);
F21V29/773 (EP);
F21V29/83 (EP);
F21V7/09 (EP);
G02B6/0006 (EP);
F21W2131/101 (EP);
F21W2131/103 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/31] | Extension states | LT | 29.03.1996 | SI | 29.03.1996 | Title | German: | LICHTERZEUGER MIT REFLEKTIERENDER FLÄCHE UND LICHTLEITER | [1996/31] | English: | LIGHT GENERATOR WITH REFLECTIVE ENCLOSURE FOR LIGHTING OR ILLUMINATING UNIT HAVING A LIGHT GUIDE | [1996/31] | French: | GENERATEUR DE LUMIERE A ENCEINTE REFLECHISSANTE POUR ENSEMBLE D'ECLAIRAGE OU D'ILLUMINATION METTANT EN OEUVRE UN GUIDE DE LUMIERE | [1998/29] |
Former [1996/31] | GENERATEUR DE LUMIERE A ENCEINTE REFLECHISSANTE POUR ENSEMBLE D'ECLAIRAGE OU D'ILLUMINATION METTANT EN UVRE UN GUIDE DE LUMIERE | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.1996 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 02.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/43] | 02.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1997 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.1998 | 31.10.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2846471 (NATH GUENTHER); | [X]US4241382 (DANIEL MAURICE [US]) [X] 1-11,17-19,37-44 * column 4, line 57 - column 10, line 10; figure - *; | [A]DE3804732 (OKA KANO & OEHMICHEN KG FORSCH [DE]); | [A]EP0401711 (ZELISKO JOSEF ELEKTRO MASCH [AT]); | [A]EP0562279 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |