EP0703844 - DEVICE FOR BREAKING SEPARATION OF BEARING CAPS OF ALIGNED BEARING BORES IN BEARING SYSTEMS OF A PART OF AN ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIESEMANN, Johann Abbachstrasse 18 b D-80992 München / DE | 02 /
LUCHNER, Clemens Josef-Ritz-Weg 98 D-81673 München / DE | [1996/14] | Application number, filing date | 95913072.5 | 09.03.1995 | [1996/14] | WO1995EP00875 | Priority number, date | DE19944413255 | 16.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4413255 | [1996/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528248 | Date: | 26.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703844 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703844 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B23D31/00, F16C9/04 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
B23D31/003 (EP,US);
F16C9/02 (EP,US);
F05C2201/0436 (EP,US);
F16C2240/30 (EP,US);
F16C2360/22 (EP,US);
F16C9/045 (EP,US);
Y10T225/30 (EP,US);
Y10T225/329 (EP,US);
Y10T225/371 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM BRUCHTRENNEN VON LAGERDECKELN FLUCHTEND ANGEORDNETER LAGERBOHRUNGEN IN LAGERANORDNUNGEN EINES MASCHINENTEILS | [1996/14] | English: | DEVICE FOR BREAKING SEPARATION OF BEARING CAPS OF ALIGNED BEARING BORES IN BEARING SYSTEMS OF A PART OF AN ENGINE | [1996/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA SEPARATION PAR RUPTURE DE CHAPEAUX DE PALIER D'ALESAGES DE PALIER ALIGNES DANS DES ENSEMBLES PALIER D'UNE PARTIE DE MOTEUR | [1996/14] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 04.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0167320 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 17* page 10, line 30 - page 13, line 28; figures 8-14 *; | [Y]WO8806942 (MTS SYSTEM CORP [US]) [Y] 3,4,12-14 * page 4, line 16 - page 11, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US5274919 (BECKER LARRY T [US]) [X] 1,2 * DAS GANZE DOKUMENT * [Y] 3,4,12-14,17 |