EP0755476 - LOCKING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLE LOCKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huf Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states HUF HÜLSBECK & FÜRST GMBH & CO. KG Steeger Strasse 17 42551 Velbert / DE | ||
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states HÜLSBECK & FÜRST GmbH & CO. KG Steeger Strasse 17 D-42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTWER, Reinhard Beuthener Strasse 26 D-42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Mentzel, Norbert, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Mentzel, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 95913081.6 | 10.03.1995 | [1997/05] | WO1995EP00895 | Priority number, date | DE19944412609 | 13.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4412609 | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528540 | Date: | 26.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755476 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755476 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/00, E05B17/04 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
E05B17/0058 (EP,US);
E05B17/04 (EP,US);
Y10T70/25 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7599 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7706 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7712 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7949 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/05] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR INSBESONDERE AN KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN VOLLZIEHBARE SCHLIESSFUNKTIONEN | [1997/05] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLE LOCKING | [1997/05] | French: | SERRURE PERMETTANT NOTAMMENT D'EXECUTER DES FONCTIONS DE VERROUILLAGE SUR DES VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [1997/05] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0444972 (VACHETTE SA [FR]) [X] 1-10 * column 6, line 38 - column 8, line 32 *; | [DA]DE4041134 (HÜLSBECK & FÜRST) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |