EP0750667 - USE OF A RECOMBINANT INHIBITOR FROM ERYTHRINA CAFFRA FOR PURIFYING SERINE PROTEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [1999/11] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHNERT, Ulrich Heubachweg 6 82392 Habach / DE | 02 /
STERN, Anne Karwendelstrasse 10 82377 Penzberg / DE | 03 /
FISCHER, Stephan Jakobifeldweg 11 82398 Polling / DE | [1997/01] | Application number, filing date | 95913095.6 | 13.03.1995 | [1997/01] | WO1995EP00926 | Priority number, date | DE19944408939 | 16.03.1994 Original published format: DE 4408939 | DE19944424171 | 08.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4424171 | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525168 | Date: | 21.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750667 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750667 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/15, C12N9/72, C07K14/81, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
C12N9/6459 (EP,US);
C07K14/8114 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21069 (EP,US);
Y10S435/814 (EP,US);
Y10S435/815 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON REKOMBINANTEM INHIBITOR AUS ERYTHRINA CAFFRA ZUR REINIGUNG VON SERINPROTEASEN | [1997/01] | English: | USE OF A RECOMBINANT INHIBITOR FROM ERYTHRINA CAFFRA FOR PURIFYING SERINE PROTEASES | [1997/01] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN INHIBITEUR RECOMBINE ISSU D'ERYTHRINA CAFFRA POUR PURIFIER DES SERINE PROTEASES | [1997/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 26.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.12.1998 | NL | 23.12.1998 | AT | 13.03.1999 | LU | 13.03.1999 | DK | 23.03.1999 | PT | 23.03.1999 | SE | 23.03.1999 | BE | 31.03.1999 | CH | 31.03.1999 | LI | 31.03.1999 | IE | 20.08.1999 | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/45] | GR | 23.12.1998 | |
NL | 23.12.1998 | ||
AT | 13.03.1999 | ||
DK | 23.03.1999 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
SE | 23.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | GR | 23.12.1998 | |
NL | 23.12.1998 | ||
AT | 13.03.1999 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
SE | 23.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 23.12.1998 | |
AT | 13.03.1999 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
SE | 23.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
IE | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 23.12.1998 | |
IE | 23.12.1998 | ||
AT | 13.03.1999 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
SE | 23.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/08] | IE | 23.12.1998 | |
AT | 13.03.1999 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | IE | 23.12.1998 | |
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | IE | 23.12.1998 | |
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | PT | 23.03.1999 | |
BE | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 23.03.1999 | Cited in | International search | [DXY]EP0218479 (SOUTH AFRICAN INVENTIONS [ZA]) [DX] 1-18 * the whole document *[Y] 19 | [DXY] - A. TEIXEIRA ET AL, "Synthesis and expression of a gene coding for Erythrina trypsin inhibitor (ETI)", BIOCHIMICA BIOPHYSICA ACTA, vol. 1217, no. 1, page 16-22 [DX] 1-18 * the whole document * [Y] 19 | [XY] - Y. KOUZUMA, "Isolation and primary structure of proteinase inhibitors from Erythrina variegata (Linn.) var. Orientalis seeds", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930913), vol. 119, no. 11, Database accession no. 111939, page 397 [X] 9-18 * abstract * [Y] 19 | [ ] - BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., vol. 56, no. 11, pages 1819 - 1824 | [DY] - J. PORATH AND B. OLIN, "Immobilized metal ion affinity adsorption and immobolized metal ion affinity chromatography of biomaterials.", BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 22, pages 1621 - 1630 [DY] 19 * the whole document * |