EP0706176 - OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NONAKA, Toshihisa 769-153, Oishi Higashi-cho, Otsu-shi Shiga 520-22 / JP | 02 /
OHBAYASHI, Gentaro 2328-16, Noji-cho, Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525 / JP | 03 /
HIROTA, Kusato A1-22, 10, Sonoyama 2-chome, Otsu-shi Shiga 520 / JP | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Coleiro, Raymond, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | Coleiro, Raymond, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 95913347.1 | 27.03.1995 | [1996/15] | WO1995JP00564 | Priority number, date | JP19940055990 | 25.03.1994 Original published format: JP 5599094 | JP19940091972 | 28.04.1994 Original published format: JP 9197294 | [1996/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526549 | Date: | 05.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0706176 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
G11B7/257 (EP,US);
G11B7/2578 (KR);
G11B7/00454 (EP,US);
G11B7/00557 (EP,US);
G11B7/24 (EP,US);
G11B7/243 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24312 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24314 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/15] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1996/15] | English: | OPTICAL RECORDING MEDIUM AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [1996/15] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OPTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1996/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.1995 | Translation filed | 18.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.1995 | Search fee paid | 18.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 17.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/27] | 11.02.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/27] | Request for further processing for: | 08.09.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]EP0541376 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [XD] 13-20,22,25,26 * the whole document * [A] 1-12,21,23,24; | [XA]US5234737 (UENO OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 13-19,22,25 * column 5, line 19 - line 52; figure 1 * [A] 1-12,16,23,24; | [XA]EP0574025 (TDK CORP [JP]) [X] 13-19,22,25 * column 1, line 3 - line 35 * * column 7, line 5 - line 8 * * column 7, line 30 - column 9, line 55 * * column 12, line 35 - line 58; figure 1 * [A] 1-12,20,21,23,24,26; | [PA]US5346740 (OHNO EIJI [JP], et al) [PA] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP0630007 (NEC CORP [JP]) [PX] 13-19 * claim 6 * | International search | [A]JPH06150375 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [A]JPH06150368 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | [A]JPH0660419 (TDK CORP) |