Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0754338
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] |
02.02.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
23.10.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
30.06.2000 |
First examination report |
|
29.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.04.2000 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
16.03.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.03.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.04.1997 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.03.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.12.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
06.12.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
17.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|
29.02.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|