Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09511843 | Global Dossier | 25.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US22440194 | 07.04.1994 | US9503450 | 20.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2103695 | Global Dossier | 30.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US22440194 | 07.04.1994 | US9503450 | 20.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0754338 | Global Dossier | 22.01.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22440194 | 07.04.1994 | US9503450 | 20.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9527973 | Global Dossier | 19.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22440194 | 07.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1146252 | 26.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US22440194 | 07.04.1994 |