EP0751749 - MEDICAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Strathclyde McCance Building, 16 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1XQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF STRATHCLYDE McCance Building, 16 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1XQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEKLETSADIK, Kasegn 8 Rannoch Place Edinburgh EH4 7HH / GB | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Leslie 35 Hillside Terrace Milton of Campsie Glasgow G65 8BP / GB | 03 /
HOWIESON, Maurice Maxwell, Rhumohr 16 Park Road Broxburn EH52 5RF / GB | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 95913899.1 | 03.04.1995 | [1997/02] | WO1995GB00759 | Priority number, date | GB19940007052 | 05.04.1994 Original published format: GB 9407052 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526686 | Date: | 12.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751749 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/36 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
A61B18/042 (EP);
A61B2017/00159 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB [1997/02] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES GERÄT | [1997/02] | English: | MEDICAL APPARATUS | [1997/02] | French: | APPAREIL MEDICAL | [1997/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 26.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/24] | 16.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]USRE34432E (BERTRAND) [X] 1-5 * page 12, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [X]GB2188845 (BARD) [X] 1-5 * page 17, column 2; figures 4,6,8 *; | [X]WO9205743 (BIRTCHER) [X] 1-5 * figure 5 *; | [X]US4060088 (MORRISON) [X] 1-5 * column 5; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0279745 (DESCARTES) [A] 1,2 * column 7, paragraph 5 *; | [A]WO9301758 (CANADY) [A] 2 * page 9, paragraph 5 *; | [A]US3903891 (BRAYSHAW) [A] 2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2828748 (AUGUST) |