EP0755550 - ALARM SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEYMOUR, John Edward 61 Springfield Road, Castle Bromwich Birmingham B36 0DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states SEYMOUR, John Edward 61 Springfield Road, Castle Bromwich Birmingham B36 0DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Gordon D., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Harrison, Gordon Donald, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/05] | Harrison, Gordon Donald FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95913917.1 | 04.04.1995 | [1997/05] | WO1995GB00778 | Priority number, date | GB19940007082 | 09.04.1994 Original published format: GB 9407082 | GB19940020501 | 11.10.1994 Original published format: GB 9420501 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527960 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755550 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755550 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/22 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
G08B25/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/05] | Title | German: | ALARMSYSTEM | [1997/05] | English: | ALARM SYSTEMS | [1997/05] | French: | SYSTEMES D'ALARME | [1997/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 27.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.1998 | BE | 30.12.1998 | CH | 30.12.1998 | ES | 30.12.1998 | GR | 30.12.1998 | LI | 30.12.1998 | DK | 30.03.1999 | PT | 30.03.1999 | SE | 30.03.1999 | IE | 04.04.1999 | LU | 04.04.1999 | [2013/11] |
Former [2007/29] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
CH | 30.12.1998 | ||
ES | 30.12.1998 | ||
GR | 30.12.1998 | ||
LI | 30.12.1998 | ||
DK | 30.03.1999 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
IE | 04.04.1999 | ||
LU | 04.04.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
CH | 30.12.1998 | ||
ES | 30.12.1998 | ||
GR | 30.12.1998 | ||
LI | 30.12.1998 | ||
DK | 30.03.1999 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
IE | 04.04.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
CH | 30.12.1998 | ||
ES | 30.12.1998 | ||
GR | 30.12.1998 | ||
LI | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
IE | 04.04.1999 | ||
MC | 30.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
CH | 30.12.1998 | ||
ES | 30.12.1998 | ||
GR | 30.12.1998 | ||
LI | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
IE | 04.04.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
CH | 30.12.1998 | ||
GR | 30.12.1998 | ||
LI | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
SE | 30.03.1999 | ||
IE | 04.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
CH | 30.12.1998 | ||
LI | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
IE | 04.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
CH | 06.04.1999 | ||
LI | 06.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
PT | 30.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 30.12.1998 | |
BE | 30.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 30.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4114147 (HILE JOHN R) [X] 1,2,14 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2161634 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,14 * abstract * * page 2, line 70 - line 101 ** page 3, line 9 - line 94 *; | [A]US4818971 (PATRICK ROBERT H [CA]) [A] 1,10,14 * abstract * * column 3, line 63 - line 68 * |