EP0754250 - COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR TREATING THE SURFACE OF ALUMINIFEROUS METALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Pike, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Pike, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IINO, Yasuo 1-2-23-305, Goten, Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken 254 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Akio 103 Lumieru Takehi, 625-2, Shimo-Ochiai Isehara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 259-11 / JP | 03 /
MOTOZAWA, Masahiro, Nihon Parkerizing Hiratsuka Dormitory, 2566, Shinomiya Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken 254 / JP | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Laurence Andrew, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Sanderson, Laurence Andrew, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 95914039.3 | 21.03.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995US03192 | Priority number, date | JP19940053779 | 24.03.1994 Original published format: JP 5377994 | JP19940307639 | 12.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30763994 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525831 | Date: | 28.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754250 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/36 | [1997/23] | CPC: |
C23C22/361 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/04] | C23C22/07, C23C22/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/04] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ALUMINIUMHALTIGER OBERFLÄCHEN | [1997/04] | English: | COMPOSITION AND PROCESS FOR TREATING THE SURFACE OF ALUMINIFEROUS METALS | [1997/04] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SURFACE DE METAUX ALUMINEUX | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 07.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 23.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/26] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPS5424232 [ ] (NIHON PARKERIZING 2-6-79); | [X]WO9012902 (HENKEL CORP) [X] 1,3-8 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]EP0411606 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1,3-8 * claims 6,8; table 1 *; | [X]EP0337075 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1,3-8 * claims 4-6; table 3 *; | [PX]WO9504169 (HENKEL CORP) [PX] 1-8 * claim 1; table 3 *; | [E]EP0726968 (HENKEL CORP) [E] 1-8 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 9; claims 1,2 *; | [A]FR2347459 (AMCHEM PROD) | [X] - NIHON PARKERIZING, "Surface treatment of Aluminum", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19790625), vol. 90, no. 26, Database accession no. 208761q, page 303, XP002001672 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4338140 ; | [X]US4422886 ; | [X]US4470853 ; | [X]US5139586 ; | [XP]US5380374 ; | [X]GB2259920 ; | [A]DE3236247 |