EP0752051 - COOLED TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELESKY, Mark, F. 931 North River Road Coventry, CT 06238 / US | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 95914154.0 | 21.03.1995 | [1997/02] | WO1995US03573 | Priority number, date | US19940218499 | 25.03.1994 Original published format: US 218499 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526459 | Date: | 05.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752051 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752051 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D5/14 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
F01D5/187 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/02] | Title | German: | KÜHLUNG EINER TURBINENSCHAUFEL | [1997/02] | English: | COOLED TURBINE BLADE | [1997/02] | French: | AILETTE DE TURBINE REFROIDIE | [1997/02] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/02] | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1548613 (WALTER KIESER) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 96 - column 2, line 101; figure 1 *; | [A]US3135496 (SCHEPER JR GEORGE W) [A] 1,2 * figures 4,8,9; claim 7 *; | [A]FR2417640 (ROLLS ROYCE [GB]) [A] * figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0185599 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1,3-5 * column W *; | [A]EP0241180 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 26 - column 4, line 38 * * column 7, line 29 - column 7, line 32; figures 1,5 * |