Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0701579 | Global Dossier | 09.09.1998 | B1 | EP0701579 | 20.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4410609 | 26.03.1994 | EP9501095 | 23.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59503512D1 | 15.10.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4410609 | 26.03.1994 | EP9501095 | 23.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5698330 | 16.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4410609 | 26.03.1994 | EP9501095 | 23.03.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9526375 | Global Dossier | 05.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4410609 | 26.03.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4410609 | 28.09.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4410609 | 26.03.1994 |