Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3505182B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2004 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP9500665 | 06.04.1995 | JP7091494 | 08.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0702948 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2001 | B1 | EP0702948 | 01.05.1996 | A4 | EP0702948 | 27.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9500665 | 06.04.1995 | JP7091494 | 08.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE199492T | 15.03.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP9500665 | 06.04.1995 | JP7091494 | 08.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69520248T | 20.09.2001 | T2 | DE69520248D1 | 12.04.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9500665 | 06.04.1995 | JP7091494 | 08.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5707611 | 13.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | JP9500665 | 06.04.1995 | JP7091494 | 08.04.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9527470 | Global Dossier | 19.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP7091494 | 08.04.1994 |