EP0702948 - TOOTH SURFACE TREATING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/13] | TOOTH SURFACE TREATMENT | ||
[2000/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHOFU 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA SHOFU 11, Fukuinekamitakamatsu-cho, Higashiyama-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 605 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEMURA, Kunio 68-205, Amazuka, Terada Joyo-shi, Kyoto 610-01 / JP | 02 /
KOURO, Yoshiaki 36-11, Minamikuzuha 2-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | 03 /
TACHIDOKORO, Hisaaki 6-15, Sawaragihigashi-machi Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 04 /
KIMOTO, Katsuya 2-13, Minamihanayashiki 3-chome Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666 / JP | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/13] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95914520.2 | 06.04.1995 | [1996/13] | WO1995JP00665 | Priority number, date | JP19940070914 | 08.04.1994 Original published format: JP 7091494 | [1996/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527470 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702948 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702948 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
A61K6/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/13] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER ZAHNOBERFLÄCHE | [2000/39] | English: | TOOTH SURFACE TREATING AGENT | [2000/39] | French: | PRODUIT DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SURFACE DES DENTS | [1996/13] |
Former [1996/13] | ZAHNOBERFLÄCHEN BEHANDLUNG | ||
Former [1996/13] | TOOTH SURFACE TREATMENT | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1995 | Translation filed | 08.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1996 | Search fee paid | 08.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/25] | 26.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2001 | BE | 07.03.2001 | NL | 07.03.2001 | DK | 07.06.2001 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 07.03.2001 | |
BE | 07.03.2001 | ||
NL | 07.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 07.03.2001 | |
BE | 07.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/03] | BE | 07.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0155812 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 2 - page 9 * * page 11, line 16 - page 12, line 18 * * page 16, line 4 - line 12 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0335645 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 45 - page 5, line 45 * * claim - *; | [X]EP0480785 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [X] 5,6* the whole document *; | [X]GB2261223 (G C DENTAL IND CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,6 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2 *; | [X]US5264513 (IKEMURA KUNIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 16 * | International search | [X]JPS61136566 (DENTSPLY INT INC); | [X]JPS62175411 (SHOFU KK, et al); | [X]JPS62175412 (SHOFU KK, et al); | [X]JPS62175410 (SHOFU KK, et al); | [X]JPS62231652 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPS63132984 (ICI PLC); | [A]JPH01279815 (KURARAY CO); | [X]JPH04360808 (TERUMO CORP) |