EP0704463 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITION, AND PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Takashi Mitsui Petrochemical Industries Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome Waki-cho Kuga-gun Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO, Mikio Mitsui Petrochemical Industries Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome Waki-cho Kuga-gun Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Masaaki Mitsui Petrochemical Industries Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome Waki-cho Kuga-gun Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 04 /
FUKUOKA, Daisuke Mitsui Petrochemical Industries Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome Waki-cho Kuga-gun Yamaguchi 740 / JP | 05 /
IMUTA, Junichi Mitsui Petrochemical Industries Ltd. 1-2, Waki 6-chome Waki-cho Kuga-gun Yamaguchi 740 / JP | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 95914559.0 | 11.04.1995 | [1996/14] | WO1995JP00708 | Priority number, date | JP19940072297 | 11.04.1994 Original published format: JP 7229794 | JP19940072308 | 11.04.1994 Original published format: JP 7230894 | [1996/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527741 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0704463 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0704463 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/06, C08F4/60, C08F2/00, C08F297/06, C08L23/14, C08L23/08 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
C08F297/086 (EP,US);
C08F10/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/06, C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F4/6492 (EP,US);
C08F110/06, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PROPYLEN-POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND PROPYLEN-POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1996/14] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITION, AND PROPYLENE POLYMER COMPOSITION | [1996/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE POLYMERE DE PROPYLENE, ET COMPOSITION DE POLYMERE PROPYLENIQUE | [1996/14] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1999/30: (deleted) | EPB 1999/30: (deleted) | EPB 1999/30: (deleted) | EPB 1997/48: Teilanmeldung 97116531.1 eingereicht am 23/09/97 | EPB 1997/48: Divisional application 97116531.1 filed on 23/09/97 | EPB 1997/48: Demande divisionnaire 97116531.1 déposée le 23/09/97 | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.1995 | Translation filed | 12.10.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.1995 | Search fee paid | 12.10.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1995 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97116531.1 / EP0816395 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9112285 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9421700 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [PX] 1-17 * example 11; claim 13 * | International search | [A]JPS57111307 (HERCULES INC); | [A]JPH04114050 (HOECHST AG); | [A]JPH04337308 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [A]JPH05202152 (HOECHST AG); | [P]JPH06206921 (HOECHST AG) | by applicant | JPH04337308 | JPH05202152 | JPH0278687 | JPH01501950 | JPH01502036 | JPH03179005 | JPH03179006 | JPH03207703 | JPH03207704 | US547718 |