EP0772803 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PHASE COMPENSATION IN A VEHICLE CONTROL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAAB AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [2000/33] |
Former [1997/20] | For all designated states SAAB-SCANIA Aktiebolag 581 88 Linköping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUNDQWIST, Lars Sten ldersgatan 31 S-582 68 Linköping / SE | 02 /
ELGCRONA, Per-Olov Tumstigen 5 S-582 66 Linköping / SE | 03 /
HILLGREN, Robert Södermalmsvägen 6 S-583 20 Linköping / SE | 04 /
SJÖBERG, Bengt Tygelgatan 33 S-582 66 Linköping / SE | 05 /
ST HL-GUNNARSSON, Karin Storsvängen 17 S-582 58 Linköping / SE | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Lundquist, Arne Patent Department Saab AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Lundquist, Arne Patent Department Saab AB 581 88 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 95914600.2 | 14.02.1995 | [1997/20] | WO1995SE00151 | Priority number, date | SE19940001847 | 30.05.1994 Original published format: SE 9401847 | US19940326517 | 20.10.1994 Original published format: US 326517 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9533229 | Date: | 07.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0772803 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0772803 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G05B6/02, G05B11/06, G05B11/36 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
G05B11/42 (EP);
G05B5/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PHASENKOMPENSIERUNG IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUGSTEUERSYSTEM | [1997/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PHASE COMPENSATION IN A VEHICLE CONTROL SYSTEM | [1997/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE PHASE POUR SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE VEHICULES | [1997/20] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 21.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 27.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3819999 (PLATT W); | [A]US4839573 (WISE WILLIAM L [US]); | [A]US5173649 (WISE WILLIAM L [US]) |