EP0752906 - FILTER ARRANGEMENT FOR FILTRATION OF A FLUID FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOMINIAK, Klaus Hillerfeldmark 2 D-45695 Recklinghausen / DE | 02 /
POMPLUN, Klaus Lindenweg 21 D-59192 Bergkamen / DE | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 95914680.4 | 27.02.1995 | [1997/03] | WO1995US02405 | Priority number, date | DE19940005390U | 30.03.1994 Original published format: DE 9405390 U | [1997/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9526802 | Date: | 12.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752906 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752906 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/42, B01D46/10, B01D46/52 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
B01D46/521 (EP);
B01D46/0005 (EP);
B01D46/10 (EP);
B60H3/0658 (EP);
B01D2265/028 (EP);
B01D2267/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1997/03] | Title | German: | FILTERANORDNUNG ZUM FILTERN EINER FLUIDSTRÖMUNG | [1997/03] | English: | FILTER ARRANGEMENT FOR FILTRATION OF A FLUID FLOW | [1997/03] | French: | APPAREIL DE FILTRATION D'UN ECOULEMENT FLUIDIQUE | [1997/03] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.1996 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.09.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.1998 | DK | 06.08.1998 | PT | 06.08.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [1999/32] | AT | 06.05.1998 | |
PT | 06.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 06.05.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6354911 ; | [A]US3942964 (SHULER BERNARD R) [A] 1,17 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 35; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2179872 (ALLIED CORP) [A] 1,2,10; | [Y]EP0329544 (POELMAN SOFILTRA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,9-12,14-16,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5222488 (FORSGREN R D [US]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,9-12,14-16,18 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-5A *; | [A]US5273563 (PASCH ROGER M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,10 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880729), vol. 12, no. 275, Database accession no. (C - 516), & JP63054911 A 19880309 (MIRUMACHI MITSUAKI) [A] 1,10-16 * abstract * |