EP0797662 - METHODS FOR TREATMENT OR DIAGNOSIS OF DISEASES OR CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH ABNORMAL SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2009 [2009/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW YORK UNIVERSITY 70 Washington Square South New York, NY 10012 / US | [2008/07] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states NEW YORK UNIVERSITY 70 Washington Square South New York, NY 10012 / US | ||
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states NEW YORK UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER 550 First Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARGOLIS, Ben, Lewis Apartment 23C, 564 First Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | 02 /
SCHLESSINGER, Joseph 37 Washington Square, West New York, NY 10011 / US | 03 /
LAX, Irit 3401 Lenox Drive Fair Lawn, NJ 07410 / US | 04 /
LADBURY, John, E. 313 East 5th Street 3C New York, NY 10003 / US | 05 /
LEMMON, Mark, A. 220 East 22nd Street 4B New York, NY 10010 / US | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Viering, Hans-Martin Viering, Jentschura & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | Viering, Hans-Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Steindorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/45] | Nobbe, Matthias, Dr. Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Centroallee 263 46047 Oberhausen / DE | ||
Former [2003/04] | Harrison Goddard Foote Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | ||
Former [1997/40] | Moon, Donald Keith, et al BREWER & SON Quality House Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 95914759.6 | 13.03.1995 | [1997/40] | WO1995US03452 | Priority number, date | US19940212234 | 14.03.1994 Original published format: US 212234 | US19940255785 | 08.06.1994 Original published format: US 255785 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9525166 | Date: | 21.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0797662 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0797662 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/71, C07K14/475, C07K14/485, C07K14/47, A61K38/17 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/485 (EP);
C07K14/475 (EP);
C07K14/71 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/40] | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER DIAGNOSE VON KRANKHEITEN ODER ZUSTÄNDEN, DIE MIT EINER ABNORMALEN SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG ASSOZIIERT SIND | [1997/40] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATMENT OR DIAGNOSIS OF DISEASES OR CONDITIONS ASSOCIATED WITH ABNORMAL SIGNAL TRANSDUCTION | [1997/40] | French: | METHODES DE TRAITEMENT OU DE DIAGNOSTIC DE MALADIES OU D'ETATS ASSOCIES A UNE TRANSDUCTION ANORMALE DES SIGNAUX | [1997/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 27.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Request for further processing for: | 18.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.02.2006 | Decision despatched | 09.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9322339 (UNIV GEORGETOWN ;LUPU RUTH (US); LIPPMAN MARC (US)) [X] 1-7 * page 11, line 10 - page 28, line 19; claims 1-22 *; | [X]WO9203476 (UNIV TEXAS) [X] 1,3,9 * page 20, line 16 - page 21, line 10; claims 1-19 * | [DX] - MARGOLIS, B. ET AL, "High-efficiency expression/cloning of epidermal growth factor-receptor-binding proteins with Src homology 2 domains", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A. (1992), 89(19), 8894-8 CODEN: PNASA6;ISSN: 0027-8424 [DX] 10-12,14-17 * page 8896, column R, line 1 - page 8898, column L, paragraph 2; figure 3 * | [X] - MARGOLIS B ET AL, "The SH2 domain protein, GRB -7, is amplified, overexpressed, and in a tight complex with HER2 in breast cancer.", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY SUPPLEMENT 0 (18B). 1994. 241. ISSN: 0733-1959 [X] 10-12,14-17 * Keystone Symposium on transmembrane signal transduction: Structure, mechanims, * * regulation of evolution, Keystone, Colorado, USA,. February 6-13, 1994; * | [DA] - TRENDS IN BIOCHEMICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL [DA] 1-17 * the whole document * | [PX] - STEIN D ET AL, "The SH2 domain protein GRB -7 is co-amplified, overexpressed and in a tight complex with HER2 in breast cancer.", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL 13 (6). 1994. 1331-1340. ISSN: 0261-4189 [PX] 10-12,14-17 * the whole document * |