EP0759300 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MOLTEN GRANULATED SUCRALFATE PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/09] | MOLTEN GRANULATED SUCRALFATE PREPARATION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
[2001/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 115 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 115 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Katsuya Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku, Tokyo 115 / JP | 02 /
OZAWA, Koichi Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku, Tokyo 115 / JP | [1997/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/09] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95915338.8 | 18.04.1995 | [1997/09] | WO1995JP00753 | Priority number, date | JP19940088855 | 26.04.1994 Original published format: JP 8885594 | JP19940189520 | 11.08.1994 Original published format: JP 18952094 | [1997/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528938 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0759300 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0759300 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K47/34, A61K9/14 | [1997/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/7024 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/7016 (EP,US);
A61K31/7135 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (KR);
A61K9/14 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/09] | Extension states | LT | 15.11.1996 | SI | 15.11.1996 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG SCHMELZ-GRANULIERTE SUCRALFATZUBEREITUNG | [2001/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MOLTEN GRANULATED SUCRALFATE PREPARATIONS | [2001/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SUCRALFATE GRANULEE ET FONDUE | [2001/23] |
Former [1997/09] | SCHMELZ-GRANULIERTE SUCRALFATZUBEREITUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR IHRE HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1997/09] | MOLTEN GRANULATED SUCRALFATE PREPARATION AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | ||
Former [1997/09] | PREPARATION DE SUCRALFATE GRANULEE ET FONDUE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1996 | Translation filed | 15.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 15.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01105293.3 / EP1110540 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.02.2002 | BE | 27.02.2002 | CH | 27.02.2002 | GR | 27.02.2002 | LI | 27.02.2002 | NL | 27.02.2002 | IE | 18.04.2002 | LU | 18.04.2002 | MC | 18.04.2002 | DK | 27.05.2002 | PT | 27.05.2002 | SE | 27.05.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
IE | 18.04.2002 | ||
MC | 18.04.2002 | ||
DK | 27.05.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
IE | 18.04.2002 | ||
MC | 18.04.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
MC | 18.04.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.02.2002 | |
BE | 27.02.2002 | ||
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 27.02.2002 | |
CH | 27.02.2002 | ||
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
NL | 27.02.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 27.02.2002 | |
LI | 27.02.2002 | ||
SE | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5196405 (PACKMAN ELIAS W [US]) [X] 1,4,5* column 8; example 4 *; | [X]WO9305645 (SMART PLANTS INT INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 11, lines 18-25 * | International search | [A]JPS6445312 (RIZAFUARUMA SPA); | [A]JPH04234324 (MERCK PATENT GMBH); | [A]JPH0539223 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH05238938 (TEIKOKU SEIYAKU KK) |