EP0755202 - SHOE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hartung, Peter Buchhörn 2 21481 Schnakenbek / DE | [1997/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Rohnke, Christian, et al Jungfernstieg 51 (Prien-Haus) Postfach 30 40 49 20313 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | Rohnke, Christian, Dr., et al Jungfernstieg 51 (Prien-Haus) Postfach 30 40 49 20313 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1997/05] | Niedmers, Ole, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Niedmers & Partner Stahltwiete 23 22761 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 95915751.2 | 11.04.1995 | [1997/05] | WO1995DE00468 | Priority number, date | DE19944412154 | 11.04.1994 Original published format: DE 4412154 | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527414 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755202 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755202 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/24 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
A43B3/242 (EP,US);
A43B3/24 (EP,US);
A43B3/244 (EP,US);
A43C11/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/05] | Title | German: | SCHUH | [1997/05] | English: | SHOE | [1997/05] | French: | CHAUSSURE | [1997/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.08.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 06.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.07.2000 | DK | 12.10.2000 | PT | 12.10.2000 | SE | 12.10.2000 | GR | 13.10.2000 | IE | 09.03.2001 | AT | 11.04.2001 | LU | 11.04.2001 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/39] | NL | 12.07.2000 | |
DK | 12.10.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 09.03.2001 | ||
AT | 11.04.2001 | ||
LU | 11.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | NL | 12.07.2000 | |
DK | 12.10.2000 | ||
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 09.03.2001 | ||
AT | 11.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 12.07.2000 | |
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 09.03.2001 | ||
AT | 11.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/08] | NL | 12.07.2000 | |
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 09.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | PT | 12.10.2000 | |
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
IE | 09.03.2001 | ||
Former [2001/50] | IE | 12.07.2000 | |
PT | 12.10.2000 | ||
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | PT | 12.10.2000 | |
SE | 12.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/18] | PT | 12.10.2000 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB874066 (IGNATZ FOLKMANN) [X] 1-6,8,10 * page 1, line 70 - page 2, line 10; figure - * [Y] 7,11; | [DY]US4103440 (LAWRENCE PETER A) [DY] 11* column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE8716546U (PORRARO) [Y] 7 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [X]US4745693 (BROWN RANDY N [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8-10 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 16; figure - * |