EP0755419 - POLYMER COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING METAL SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Pike, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states HENKEL CORPORATION 140 Germantown Pike, Suite 150 Plymouth Meeting, PA 19462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA, Masayuki 20-4, Nakao-cho, Asahi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 241 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Shigeo 2-26-37, Konan Konan-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 233 / JP | 03 /
MIYAFUJI, Kazutomo 2-30-19, Komyodai, Izumi-shi Osaka-fu 590-02 / JP | [1997/05] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Laurence Andrew, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/05] | Sanderson, Laurence Andrew, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 95916297.5 | 14.04.1995 | [1997/05] | WO1995US04435 | Priority number, date | JP19940077209 | 15.04.1994 Original published format: JP 7720994 | [1997/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528449 | Date: | 26.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755419 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755419 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/08, C23F11/10, C09D5/12 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
C23C22/34 (EP);
C09D5/12 (EP);
C23C22/08 (EP);
C23C22/48 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/05] | C09D5/08, C23F11/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/05] | Title | German: | POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON METALLOBERFLÄCHEN | [1997/05] | English: | POLYMER COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR TREATING METAL SURFACES | [1997/05] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMERE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES METALLIQUES | [1997/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1996 | Search fee paid | 12.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 14.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [AP]US5374365 ; | [A]US4714752 | Examination | EP0509702 |