EP0754021 - TOXICITY RESISTANT TAMPON STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silber, Arthur L. 543 Dobbins Avenue San Gabriel, CA 91775 / US | [1997/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95916326.2 | 12.04.1995 | [1997/04] | WO1995US04480 | Priority number, date | US19940228503 | 15.04.1994 Original published format: US 228503 | US19940363920 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: US 363920 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528139 | Date: | 26.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754021 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/24 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
A61F5/4553 (EP,US);
A61F13/2051 (EP,US);
A61F13/34 (EP,US);
A61F13/202 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15081 (EP,US);
Y10S604/904 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | TAMPONSTRUKTUR WELCHE KEIN TOXISCHES SCHOCKSYSTEM VERURSACHT | [1997/04] | English: | TOXICITY RESISTANT TAMPON STRUCTURE | [1997/04] | French: | STRUCTURE DE TAMPON NE PROVOQUANT PAS DE REACTION TOXIQUE | [1997/04] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.1996 | Search fee paid | 24.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/04] | 03.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/18] | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1999 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [XP]US5342331 (SILBER ARTHUR L [US], et al); | [X]US4486191 (JACOB JOSEPH [US]) |