EP0758300 - GRID FOR PRODUCING A PATTERN ON A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IPC TECHNOLOGIES INC. Suite 90, 1480 Foster Street White Rock British Columbia V4P 3X7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states IPC TECHNOLOGIES INC. Suite 90, 1480 Foster Street White Rock, British Columbia V4P 3X7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oliver, Gerry B. 3738 Mission Springs Drive Kelowna, British Columbia V1Y 3M1 / CA | 02 /
Burton, Bruce L. Rural Route No. 5, Site No. 4, Compartment No. 2 Kelowna, British Columbia V1X 4K4 / CA | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 95916526.7 | 21.04.1995 | [1997/08] | WO1995CA00236 | Priority number, date | US19940237153 | 03.05.1994 Original published format: US 237153 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529820 | Date: | 09.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758300 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758300 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B44F9/04, E04F21/04 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
E01C9/002 (EP,US);
B44F9/04 (EP,US);
E04F21/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/08] | Title | German: | GITTER ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES MUSTERS AUF EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [1997/08] | English: | GRID FOR PRODUCING A PATTERN ON A SURFACE | [1997/08] | French: | TRAME PRODUISANT UN MOTIF SUR UNE SURFACE | [1997/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1996 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.1996 | Examination requested [1997/08] | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3692458 (KIRSCH ALBERT) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 34 *; | [XA]EP0160315 (OSADA HIDEHARU) [X] 15,20-24 * page 6, line 1 - page 15, line 6 * [A] 1,4,11-13; | [A]EP0589673 (BAKER COLIN ALBERT [GB]) [A] 1* column 2, line 6 - column 7, line 41 * |