04.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
07.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
12.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] |
11.01.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] |
09.03.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] |
26.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
03.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
08.09.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
01.09.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] |
17.09.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] |
27.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.04.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.03.1998 |
First examination report |
|
06.03.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.05.1997 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
31.05.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.12.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
06.12.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
17.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.1996 |
PCT data prior to European publication - basic fee paid |
|