EP0702523 - CHAIR OR ARMCHAIR FOOTREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): MC | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moine, Pierre Huilly/Seille F-71290 Cuisery / FR | [1996/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 95916735.4 | 11.04.1995 | [1996/13] | WO1995FR00459 | Priority number, date | FR19940004316 | 12.04.1994 Original published format: FR 9404316 | [1996/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9527422 | Date: | 19.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702523 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702523 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/50 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
A47C7/506 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | FUSSTÜTZE FÜR EINEN STUHL ODER EINEN LEHNSTUHL | [1996/13] | English: | CHAIR OR ARMCHAIR FOOTREST | [1996/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REPOSE-JAMBES POUR SIEGE OU FAUTEUIL | [1996/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 14.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 25.02.1998 | MC | 31.10.1998 | [2003/18] |
Former [2003/17] | GR | 25.02.1998 | |
MC | 03.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | GR | 25.02.1998 | |
MC | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/26] | MC | 31.10.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2918964 (FRANCOIS BRAUN) [A] 1* column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 10; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4678229 (RYAN JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 19; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE3718645 (INTERIOR ART DESIGN STUDIO LTD [CH]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 38 - column 10, line 38; figures 1-6 * |