EP0757801 - OPTICAL FIBRE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.1998 [1998/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. RAYCHEM S.A. Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [1997/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCKX, Joris, Isabella Halmenhoek 7 B-2820 Bonheiden / BE | 02 /
CLITS, Patrick Roeselberg 291 B-3390 Houwaart / BE | 03 /
VAN HEES, Jan Gemeentestraat 1 Bus 1 B-3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Clayton-Hathway, Anthony Nicholas Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan, Swindon Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | Clayton, Anthony Nicholas Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Dept. Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 95916746.1 | 24.04.1995 | [1997/07] | WO1995GB00918 | Priority number, date | GB19940008292 | 26.04.1994 Original published format: GB 9408292 | [1997/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529418 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757801 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/46, G02B6/48 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
G02B6/4453 (EP);
G02B6/44765 (EP,KR);
G02B6/44528 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/07] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER FASERVERBINDER | [1997/07] | English: | OPTICAL FIBRE CONNECTOR | [1997/07] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [1997/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1996 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.10.1996 | Examination requested [1997/07] | 04.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/07] | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3530162 (ROSE WALTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2; | [A]US4840449 (GHANDEHARIZADEH SHAHRYAR [US]) [A] 1,2; | [A]EP0408266 (BICC PLC [GB], et al)[A] 1,2; | [A]US5100221 (CARNEY WILLIAM V [US], et al) [A] 1,2 |