EP0705216 - FILLING CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reeves, Leslie Neville 17 Links Road, Romiley Stockport, Cheshire SK6 4HN / GB | [1996/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Middlemist, Ian Alastair, et al Wilson Gunn Stockport Office 26 Lockside Marple Stockport SK6 6BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/37] | Middlemist, Ian Alastair, et al Wilson Gunn M'Caw & Co. 26 Lockside Marple Stockport, Cheshire SK6 6BN / GB | ||
Former [1996/15] | Middlemist, Ian Alastair Wilson Gunn M'Caw & Co. Premier House 14 Cross Burgess Street Sheffield S1 2HG / GB | Application number, filing date | 95916765.1 | 25.04.1995 | [1996/15] | WO1995GB00942 | Priority number, date | GB19940008657 | 30.04.1994 Original published format: GB 9408657 | GB19940014158 | 13.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9414158 | [1996/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9529864 | Date: | 09.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705216 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705216 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65G69/18 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
B65G69/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/15] | Title | German: | LADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR BEHÄLTER | [1996/15] | English: | FILLING CONTAINERS | [1996/15] | French: | REMPLISSAGE DE RECIPIENTS | [1996/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.1996 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 18.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.04.1998 | [2004/37] | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE9319205U (STANELLE KARL HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 3,10; | [X]US3858733 (MORIOKA AKIRA, et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,13 * column W *; | [Y]US3738464 (ORTLIP E, et al) [Y] 3,10 * column W *; | [A]US4194615 (SIWERSSON OLLE L [SE], et al) [A] 1,12 * column W *; | [A]DE2821210 (IBAU HAMBURG ING GES) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3838541 (LADWEIN ROSEMARIE [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |