EP0714521 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIELD DISTORTION IN A MAGNETIC STRUCTURE USING SPATIAL FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW YORK UNIVERSITY 70 Washington Square South New York, NY 10012 / US | [1996/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABELE, Manlio, G. 5 East 22nd Street New York, NY 10016 / US | 02 /
RUSINEK, Henry 24 Florence Street Great Neck, NY 11023 / US | 03 /
JENSEN, Jens 25 Harrison Avenue Harrison, NY 10528 / US | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1996/23] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 95917046.5 | 12.04.1995 | [1996/23] | WO1995US04779 | Priority number, date | US19940228291 | 15.04.1994 Original published format: US 228291 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9528657 | Date: | 26.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0714521 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.10.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0714521 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.10.1995 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/14, H01F7/02 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
G01R33/3873 (EP,US);
G01R33/3806 (EP,US);
G01R33/383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR FIELDVERFORMUNGSKOMPENSATION IN EINER MAGNETISCHEN STRUKTUR UNTER BENUTZUNG EINES RAUMFILTERS | [2001/51] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR COMPENSATION OF FIELD DISTORTION IN A MAGNETIC STRUCTURE USING SPATIAL FILTER | [1996/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMPENSATION DE DISTORSION DU CHAMP D'UNE STRUCTURE MAGNETIQUE A FILTRE SPATIAL | [1996/23] |
Former [1996/23] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR FIELDVERFORMUNGSKOMPENSATION IN EINER MAGNETISCHE STRUKTUR UNTER BENUTZUNG EINES RAUMFILTER | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1995 | Search fee paid | 02.12.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 10.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.10.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9222076 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [X] 1-3,16,17,19 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 4, paragraph 11 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 4 * * figures 1-5,7-10 * [A] 4-11; | [X]EP0407227 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS [JP]) [X] 1-7,16-21 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 12 * * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 35 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4943774 (BRENEMAN BRUCE C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,16,17,19-21 * column 3, line 1 - line 35 * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 22 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 22 * * figures 4,6,7 *; | [X] - M.G. ABELE, H. RUSINEK, "Field Computation in Permanent Magnets", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, (1992), vol. 28, pages 931 - 934, XP000258114 [X] 1-4,16-21 * the whole article * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.120031 | [X] - H. ZIJLSTRA, "Permanent Magnet Systems for NMR Tomography", PHILIPS JOURNAL OF RESEARCH, (1985), vol. 40, pages 259 - 288, XP002022168 [X] 1-3,16-22 * pages 261-265, cghapters 4 and 5 * * pages 283-284, chapter 15 * * figures 16,17 * | [X] - H. SAKURAI ET AL., "Improvement of the Field Homogeneity with a Permanent Magnet Assembly for MRI", IEEE TRANSLATION JOURNAL ON MAGNETICS IN JAPAN, (1991), vol. 6, pages 524 - 530, XP000306788 [X] 1-3,16,17,19-21 * the whole article * | International search | [AP]US5382905 (MIYATA KOJI [JP], et al) |