EP0760091 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AN ANALYTE IN A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH 68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESSENPREIS, Matthias Am Wuermufer 8 D-82131 Gauting / DE | 02 /
BOECKER, Dirk Kirchstrasse 14 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
HEIN, Heinz-Michael Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 77 D-64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 04 /
HAAR, Hans-Peter Waldstrasse 2 D-69168 Wiesloch / DE | [1997/10] | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/10] | Pfeifer, Hans-Peter, Dr., Dr. H.-P. Pfeifer Dr. P. Jany, Patentanwälte, et al Beiertheimer Allee 19 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 95917276.8 | 03.05.1995 | [1997/10] | WO1995DE00593 | Priority number, date | DE19944417639 | 19.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4417639 | WO1994DE01290 | 29.10.1994 Original published format: PCT/DE94/01290 | [1997/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9532416 | Date: | 30.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760091 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760091 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/47, A61B5/00 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/1455 (EP);
A61B5/14532 (EP);
G01N21/49 (EP);
A61B2562/0233 (EP);
A61B2562/0242 (EP);
A61B2562/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES ANALYTEN IN EINER BIOLOGISCHEN PROBE | [1997/10] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING AN ANALYTE IN A BIOLOGICAL SAMPLE | [1997/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA DETERMINATION D'UN ANALYTE DANS UN ECHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE | [1997/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.1996 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 21.07.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 03.11.1999 | FR | 03.11.1999 | GB | 03.11.1999 | GR | 03.11.1999 | IT | 03.11.1999 | NL | 03.11.1999 | SE | 03.11.1999 | DK | 03.02.2000 | PT | 03.02.2000 | AT | 03.05.2000 | LU | 03.05.2000 | BE | 31.05.2000 | CH | 31.05.2000 | LI | 31.05.2000 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
FR | 03.11.1999 | ||
GB | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
AT | 03.05.2000 | ||
LU | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2004/39] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
GB | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
AT | 03.05.2000 | ||
LU | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
GB | 03.11.1999 | ||
GR | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
AT | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
GB | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
DK | 03.02.2000 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
AT | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
GB | 03.11.1999 | ||
NL | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
AT | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 03.11.1999 | |
GB | 03.11.1999 | ||
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
AT | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GB | 03.11.1999 | |
SE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
AT | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GB | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
AT | 03.05.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | GB | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
CH | 31.05.2000 | ||
LI | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | GB | 03.11.1999 | |
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
BE | 31.05.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | GB | 03.11.1999 | |
IE | 03.11.1999 | ||
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | GB | 03.11.1999 | |
PT | 03.02.2000 | ||
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/06] | PT | 03.02.2000 | |
FR | 31.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | PT | 03.02.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9311701 (VIVASCAN CORP) [A] 1,18 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, lines 14-16 * * claim 5 *; | [A]WO9009003 (NIM) [A] 1,18 * page 5, lines 6-27 * * page 10, line 13 - page 12, line 4 * * page 17, lines 1-21 *; | [A]WO8912223 (BARBOUR, R. ET AL.) [A] 1,18 * page 9, lines 5-33 * * page 23, line 13 - page 24, line 26 * | [DA] - A. DUNCAN ET AL., "a multiwavelength, wideband, intensity modulated optical spectrometer for infrared spectroscopy and imaging", SPIE PROCCEEDINGS, ISSN 0-8194-1115, (199309), vol. 1888, pages 248 - 257 [DA] 1,18 * page 252 - page 253 * * page 255, paragraph 3 * | Examination | EP0580414 | EP0592200 | EP0627619 | EP0627620 | EP0663591 |